Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Albani

Deceased

Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archives

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

Librarian of the Vatican Library


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1692BornUrbino, Italy
16 Jul 172128.8Elevated to Cardinal
24 Sep 172128.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
23 Sep 172229.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
174047.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
11 Mar 174350.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
10 Apr 174754.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
12 Aug 176168.8AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
12 Aug 176168.8AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
11 Dec 177987.2DiedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Albani:
Cardinal Alessandro Albani (born , died ) Archivist of Vatican Secret Archives

  • a cardinal for 58.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jul 1721

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013