Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignace André Akhidjan

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian)

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian)


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jun 1656Ordained BishopBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria
1661²SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
23 Apr 1663ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
23 Apr 1663ConfirmedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
24 Jul 1677DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignace André Akhidjan:
Patriarch Ignace André Akhidjan (died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 87
  • ob/c2: CB, 26 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013