Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Amico Cardinal Agnifili (de Roccha)

Deceased

Bishop of L’Aquila

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1398¹BornCollemezzo
4 May 143133.3AppointedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
14 May 143133.4Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
18 Sep 146769.7Elevated to Cardinal
13 Nov 146769.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
13 Oct 146971.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
1472²74.0ResignedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
20 Aug 147678.6AppointedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
9 Nov 147678.9DiedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Amico Agnifili (de Roccha):
Cardinal Amico Agnifili (de Roccha) (died ) Bishop of L’Aquila

  • a bishop for 45.5 years
  • a cardinal for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1467
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 91
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,713

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013