Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfonso Cardinal Aguilar Fernández de Córdoba

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1653Born
22 Jul 169743.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Sep 169945.9DiedCardinal-Priest

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Aguilar Fernández de Córdoba (VIAF: 89065403)
Alfonso Cardinal Aguilar Fernández de Córdoba (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontilla, Spain

  • a cardinal for 2.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jul 1697
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 248, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018