Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adenolfo

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 May 1288AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
1 Oct 1295AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
2 Jan 1301AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
1302¹ResignedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adenolfo
Archbishop Adenolfo , Archbishop of Conza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 203, and Page 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Aug 2021

Quantcast