Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Matteo Acquaviva d’Aragona

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Jul 1558AppointedBishop of Venafro, Italy
16 Sep 1573AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
6 Nov 1576DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Matteo Acquaviva d’Aragona
Archbishop Andrea Matteo Acquaviva d’Aragona (died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

EventPlace
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 328, and Page 184
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1558, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018