Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Acciaiuoli, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montecassino

Bishop of Monte Cassino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1298¹BornFirenze
8 Jun 132830.4AppointedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
26 Jun 134244.5AppointedBishop of Firenze, Italy
18 Mar 135557.2AppointedBishop of Monte Cassino, Italy
4 Oct 135759.8DiedBishop of Monte Cassino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Acciaiuoli:
Bishop Angelo Acciaiuoli O.P. (died ) Bishop of Montecassino

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 98, and Page 250
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 169
  • b: CB, 12 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013