Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Acciaioli

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1340Born
3 Dec 137535.6AppointedBishop of Rapolla, Italy
1383²42.7AppointedBishop of Firenze, Italy
17 Dec 138444.6Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 138545.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
1386²45.7ResignedBishop of Rapolla, Italy
1395¹54.7AppointedAdministrator of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece
29 Aug 139757.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
1405¹64.7ResignedAdministrator of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece
31 May 140868.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Acciaioli (VIAF: 171730062)
Angelo Cardinal Acciaioli (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Diocese of Firenze, Italy

  • a cardinal for 23.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1384
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 412, and Page 394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast