Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal de Aragón-Córdoba-Cardona y Fernández de Córdoba

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1616BornLucena, Italy
27 Apr 164225.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 164730.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
14 Mar 165033.3Elevated to Cardinal
7 Oct 165033.9DiedCardinal-Deacon

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Aragón-Córdoba-Cardona y Fernández de Córdoba:
Cardinal Antonio de Aragón-Córdoba-Cardona y Fernández de Córdoba (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of (unknown)

  • a priest for 8.4 years
  • a cardinal for 3.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Oct 1647
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 248, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 21 Jan 2014