Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Marie Abbati

Deceased

Bishop of Carpentras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1660BornPesaro
Jan 1692³31.9AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Portugal
Jun 1692³32.3ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Portugal
26 Sep 170646.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Oct 170646.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 170747.4AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
21 Jul 171050.5AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
22 Apr 173575.2DiedBishop of Carpentras, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Marie Abbati
Bishop François-Marie Abbati (born , died ) Bishop of Carpentras

  • a priest for 28.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 144, and Page 329
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016