Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuliano , O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1350¹AppointedBishop of Cardica, Greece
20 Jun 1357AppointedBishop of Nebbio, France
3 Jul 1363AppointedBishop of Acerno, Italy
11 Aug 1371AppointedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuliano
Bishop Giuliano O.F.M. , Bishop Emeritus of Lettere (-Gragnano)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 360, and Page 68
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 69, and Page 309
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Feb 2021

Quantcast