Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesse Perchofer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

Titular Bishop of Belline


Events

DateEventTitle
4 May 1648AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
4 May 1648AppointedTitular Bishop of Belline
14 Jun 1648Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belline
8 Sep 1681DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Jesse Perchofer:
Bishop Jesse Perchofer (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015